US SR93 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1663; text: CR S1661)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1663; text: CR S1661)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of March 2, 2019, as Gold Star Families Remembrance Day.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of March 2, 2019, as "Gold Star Families Remembrance Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1663; text: CR S1661) |
Same As/Similar To
HR39 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HR269 (Related) 2019-03-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HR269 (Related) 2019-03-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/93/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres93/BILLS-116sres93ats.pdf |