UT HB0039 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0039S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Candidate Amendments
Title
Candidate Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House/ failed (Y: 16 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House/ failed (Y: 16 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | House/ substituted in HSUB |
2013-02-13 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2013-01-31 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2013-01-31 | House | House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB |
2013-01-31 | House | House/ motion to reconsider in HCLERK |
2013-01-30 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2013-01-30 | House | House/ failed in HCLERK |
2013-01-30 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDHB |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in HSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-15 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK |
2013-01-15 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-01-11 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2013-01-11 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2012-12-19 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-12-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-11-15 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-11-15 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0039S01 (Replaced by) 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV