UT HB0055 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Income Tax Credit for Purchase of Transit Pass
Title
Income Tax Credit for Purchase of Transit Pass
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House/ failed (Y: 29 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-02-14 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-02-14 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ failed in HCLERK |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-24 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTREV |
2014-02-24 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTREV |
2014-02-24 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTREV |
2014-02-14 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in HSTREV |
2014-02-14 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTREV |
2014-02-11 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTREV |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HCLERK |
2014-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-01-20 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2014-01-15 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-01-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |