UT HB0059 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Governor Vetoed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Governor Vetoed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Credit for Alternative Fuel Heavy Duty Vehicles
Title
Tax Credit for Alternative Fuel Heavy Duty Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Governor Vetoed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2020-03-23 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2020-03-23 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-16 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-11 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-11 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-10 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-10 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2020-03-10 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2020-03-10 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-28 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-28 | House | House/ floor amendment # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-28 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-25 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-25 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-24 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-23 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |