UT HB0113 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Students with Disabilities Funding Revisions
Title
Students with Disabilities Funding Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-10 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-03-10 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-03 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-03 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-01 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-01 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in Senate Substituted Bill |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-14 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-03 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-03 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Education Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Education Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-10 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Charter Schools
Disabilities
Education
K-12 Education
School Districts
School Finance
Special Education
State Board of Education
State School Funding Distribution
Disabilities
Education
K-12 Education
School Districts
School Finance
Special Education
State Board of Education
State School Funding Distribution