UT HB0135 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco Settlement Funds Amendments
Title
Tobacco Settlement Funds Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-10 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-02-14 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-16 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-14 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-14 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Cigarette and Tobacco Taxes
Courts
Department of Human Services
Government Operations (State Issues)
Health
Human Services
Judicial Operations
Mental Health
Public Budgeting
Public Funds and Accounts
Substance Abuse
Tobacco and Other Nicotine Products
Courts
Department of Human Services
Government Operations (State Issues)
Health
Human Services
Judicial Operations
Mental Health
Public Budgeting
Public Funds and Accounts
Substance Abuse
Tobacco and Other Nicotine Products