UT HB0146 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law Enforcement by Federal Land Management Agency
Title
Law Enforcement by Federal Land Management Agency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-18 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-03-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2010-03-11 | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES | |
2010-03-11 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-03-10 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2010-03-10 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2010-03-10 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2010-03-09 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2010-03-02 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2010-03-02 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-03-01 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTNAE | |
2010-02-26 | House/ to standing committee in HSTNAE | |
2010-02-24 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-24 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-23 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-23 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |