UT HB0204 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jury Trial Amendments
Title
Jury Trial Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE | |
2010-03-02 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTJUD | |
2010-01-25 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-25 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-18 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0204.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hb0204.pdf |