UT HB0209 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to Civil and Criminal Actions
Title
Amendments to Civil and Criminal Actions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2024-03-12 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2024-03-12 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-12 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-02 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-03-02 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-03-01 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2024-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2024-03-01 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2024-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2024-03-01 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-12 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-09 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-09 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
77 | 38 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78A | 7 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |