UT HB0274 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Health Education Amendments
Title
Health Education Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 10 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 43 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 43 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ failed in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-24 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-24 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-17 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-17 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-16 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-16 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Education Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Education Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Education Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-31 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-31 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-31 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Charter Schools
Education
K-12 Education
School Districts
Standards and Curriculum
State Board of Education
Student health and safety
Education
K-12 Education
School Districts
Standards and Curriculum
State Board of Education
Student health and safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53G | 10 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53G | 10 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |