UT HB0301 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute Pesticide Application Notification Amendments
Title
Substitute Pesticide Application Notification Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Brian King [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - House/ failed (Y: 29 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2015-02-25 | House/ failed in Clerk of the House | |
2015-02-25 | House | House/ floor amendment # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-25 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-18 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-18 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-18 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-02-13 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2015-02-10 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2015-02-10 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-02-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |