UT HB0326 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Special and Local District Transparency Amendments
Title
Special and Local District Transparency Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2016-03-10 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-09 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-15 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-12 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-12 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-10 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-02-10 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-02-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Limited Purpose Local Government Entities
Local Districts
Local Governments
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Special Service District
Local Districts
Local Governments
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Special Service District
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/static/HB0326.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/hbillint/HB0326.pdf |