UT HB0331 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibition on Firearm Modification Devices
Title
Prohibition on Firearm Modification Devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Comm - Held in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-13 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-13 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |