UT HB0398 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Higher Education Student Speech Rights
Title
Higher Education Student Speech Rights
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Coleman [R] | Sen. Todd Weiler [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-06 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-02 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-02 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-02 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-14 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |