UT HB0530 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Licensed School Psychological Practitioner Amendments
Title
Licensed School Psychological Practitioner Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2024-03-11 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2024-03-11 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-11 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-29 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-29 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-29 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-29 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-26 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-26 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Business and Labor Committee |
2024-02-23 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-12 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-12 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Business
Department of Commerce
Education
Health and Human Services
Health Care
Health Care Professionals
K-12 Education
Mental Health
Mental Health Professionals
Occupational and Professional Licensing
Psychologists
Student health and safety
Department of Commerce
Education
Health and Human Services
Health Care
Health Care Professionals
K-12 Education
Mental Health
Mental Health Professionals
Occupational and Professional Licensing
Psychologists
Student health and safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 61 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 61 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 61 | 308 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |