UT HCR002 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Supporting Renewable and Sustainable Energy Options to Promote Rural Economic Development
Title
Concurrent Resolution Supporting Renewable and Sustainable Energy Options to Promote Rural Economic Development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2019-03-22 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2019-03-22 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-22 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-14 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-02-14 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-02-14 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-02-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2019-02-13 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2019-02-13 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2019-02-12 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-12 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-12 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-01-29 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-01-29 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-01-29 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-01-29 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-01-28 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-01-28 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-01-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-01-28 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-12-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |