UT HR0004 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-23 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-23 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Rules Resolution on House Procedure
Title
House Rules Resolution on House Procedure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2020-03-23 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-16 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-10 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-10 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-09 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-09 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-03-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |