UT SB0125 | 2019 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Vehicle Registration Records Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Registration Records Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2019-03-21 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2019-03-21SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2019-03-19SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2019-03-19SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2019-03-08 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2019-03-08 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2019-03-07 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2019-03-07SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2019-03-06SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2019-03-06SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2019-03-06HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2019-03-06HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2019-03-05HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2019-03-05HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Transportation Committee
2019-03-05HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee
2019-02-27HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee
2019-02-26HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2019-02-26HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2019-02-26HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2019-02-26HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2019-02-26SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-02-25SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2019-02-25SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-02-08SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-02-08SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2019-02-07SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2019-02-07SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2019-02-06SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2019-02-05SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2019-02-05SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2019-02-01SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2019-02-01SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-02-01 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-02-01 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-02-01 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback