UT SB0160 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Utah State Developmental Center Amendments
Title
Utah State Developmental Center Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-16 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-10 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-10 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-09 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-09 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2010-03-08 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-04 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-02 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTTRA | |
2010-03-01 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2010-02-26 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2010-02-15 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in S2ND | |
2010-02-12 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S2ND | |
2010-02-12 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTHHS | |
2010-02-09 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTHHS | |
2010-02-09 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-09 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |