UT SB0187 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor Vetoed in Executive Branch - Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor Vetoed in Executive Branch - Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Education Agency Policies Amendments
Title
Local Education Agency Policies Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Governor Vetoed in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-15 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-09 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-09 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-05 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ substituted from # 3 to # 4 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-02 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Education Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-26 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-26 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 3 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-11 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Education
Health
K-12 Education
Local Health Departments
State Board of Education
Student health and safety
Health
K-12 Education
Local Health Departments
State Board of Education
Student health and safety