UT SB1001 | 2017 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Port of Entry and Axle Weight Amendments
Title
Port of Entry and Axle Weight Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Don Ipson [R] | Rep. Lee Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-20 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-22 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2017-09-21 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-09-20 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-09-20 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2017-09-20 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2017-09-20 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2017-09-20 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2017-09-20 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2017-09-20 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2017-09-20 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2017-09-20 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-09-20 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2017-09-20 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2017-09-20 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-09-19 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-09-18 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-09-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-09-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |