VA HB1 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1149)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1149)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; no excuse required. Permits any registered voter to vote by absentee ballot in any election in which he is qualified to vote. The bill removes the current list of statutory reasons under which a person may be entitled to vote by absentee ballot and removes references to those reasons from other sections of the Code.
Title
Absentee voting; no excuse required, voting by absentee ballot.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (62-Y 34-N) (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1149) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1149 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Adoption (62-Y 34-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (62-Y 34-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (25-Y 15-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (10-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-30 | House | VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House ((65-Y 35-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106251D-H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-24 | House | Incorporates HB209 (Murphy) |
2020-01-24 | House | Incorporates HB208 (Murphy) |
2020-01-24 | House | Incorporates HB25 (Lindsey) |
2020-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106251D-H1 |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2019-11-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-11-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101095D |
Same As/Similar To
HB25 (Similar To) 2020-01-24 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
HB208 (Similar To) 2020-01-24 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
HB209 (Similar To) 2020-01-24 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
HB208 (Similar To) 2020-01-24 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
HB209 (Similar To) 2020-01-24 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 416.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 452 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 702.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 703.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 703.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 705.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 705.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 709 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |