VA HB208 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-24 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-24 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; absentee voting by persons age 65 or older. Entitles persons who will be age 65 or older on the date of an election for which an absentee ballot is requested to vote absentee.
Title
Elections; absentee voting by persons age 65 or older.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | House | Incorporated by Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1-Herring) by voice vote |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2019-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101230D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Similar To) 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1149)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB208 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB208+hil |