VA HB100 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0157)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0157)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voir dire examination of persons called as jurors; criminal case. Allows the court and counsel for either party in a criminal case to (i) ask potential jurors any relevant question to ascertain whether the juror can sit impartially in either the guilt or sentencing phase of the case and (ii) inform any potential juror as to the potential range of punishments to ascertain if the person or juror can sit impartially in the sentencing phase of the case.
Title
Voir dire examination of persons called as jurors; criminal case.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (64-Y 36-N) (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 3-N) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 3-N) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0157) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 157 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 4, 2020 | |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB100ER) |
2020-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-19 | House | VOTE: Adoption (64-Y 36-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108209D-S1 (64-Y 36-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB100S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108209D-S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108209D-S1 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-31 | House | VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (72-Y 27-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB100H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106547D-H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106547D-H1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-12-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101375D |
Same As/Similar To
SB325 (Same As) 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)