VA HB108 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0417)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0417)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Legal holidays; Lee-Jackson Day; Election Day. Designates Election Day, the Tuesday after the first Monday in November, as a state holiday and removes Lee-Jackson Day as a state holiday.
Title
Legal holidays; Election Day, removes Lee-Jackson Day as state holiday.
Sponsors
Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0417) | |
2020-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 417 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB108ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules (14-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 42-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (13-Y 5-N) |
2019-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-12-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101370D |
Same As/Similar To
SB601 (Same As) 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)