VA HB1083 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0670)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0670)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; payment for medical services. Limits the liability of an employer for medical treatment provided to an injured person that is rendered by a nurse practitioner or physician assistant serving as an assistant-at surgery to no more than 20 percent of the reimbursement due to the physician performing the surgery and the liability for treatment provided by an assistant surgeon in the same specialty as the primary surgeon to no more than 50 percent of the reimbursement due to the physician performing the surgery. The measure requires multiple procedures completed on a single surgical site associated with medical, surgical, and hospital services rendered on or after July 1, 2014, to be coded and billed with appropriate Current Procedural Terminology modifiers and paid according to the National Correct Coding Initiative rules and hospital in-patient care to be coded and billed through the International Statistical Classification of Diseases and Related Health Problems. The measure also (i) establishes prompt payment requirements with respect to health care services provided under the Workers' Compensation Act; (ii) prohibits an employer or insurer from seeking recovery of a payment made to a health care provider for health care services rendered after July 1, 2014, absent fraud, unless recovery is sought less than one year from the date payment was made; (iii) prohibits a health care provider from submitting a claim to the Workers' Compensation Commission contesting the sufficiency of payment for health care services rendered to a claimant on or after July 1, 2014, unless such claim is filed within one year from the date the last payment is received by the provider or the date the medical award for a specific item or treatment that is denied or contested by the employer becomes final; (iv) provides that health care providers located outside of the Commonwealth shall be reimbursed according to these prompt payment and claims limitations and the "same community" shall be deemed the principal place of business of the employer if located in the Commonwealth or, if no such location exists, the location where the Commission hearing regarding the dispute is conducted; and (v) clarifies the application of the balance billing prohibition.
Title
Workers' compensation; cost and payment for medical services, claims filed with Commission, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0670) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 670 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1083ER) |
2014-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105308D-S1 (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1083S1 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105308D-S1 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105308D-S1 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Worker's Compensation |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1083H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104776D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104776D-H1 |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Workers Comp |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103623D |