VA HB1158 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative Process Act; executive branch agencies. Requires executive branch agencies to ensure that certain regulations and guidance documents under the Virginia Register Act and Administrative Process Act, as appropriate, are posted on the Virginia Regulatory Town Hall according to instructions issued by the Department of Planning and Budget.
Title
Administrative Process Act; requirement of executive branch agencies.
Sponsors
Del. AC Cordoza [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in General Laws |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104553D |
Same As/Similar To
SB473 (Similar To) 2024-01-31 - Stricken at request of Patron in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)