VA HB1207 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Housing and Community Development; Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; affordable housing; criminal record screening model policy. Requires the Director of the Department of Housing and Community Development (the Department) to develop a criminal record screening model policy for admitting or denying an applicant for affordable housing covered under the Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act in accordance with the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development's guidance on the application of the Fair Housing Act and maintain such model policy on its website. The bill prohibits a landlord of an affordable housing unit from inquiring about or requiring disclosure of, or if such information is received, basing an adverse action, in whole or in part, on an applicant's criminal or arrest record unless the landlord does so in accordance with the criminal record screening model policy developed by the Department and posted on its website and provides the applicant with a written copy of such policy. The bill directs the Department to convene a stakeholder group to provide input into the development of the criminal record screening model policy.
Title
Va. Residential Landlord & Tenant Act; affordable housing, criminal record screening policy.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] | Del. Irene Shin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1207ER) |
2024-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (51-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-12 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House (51-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 24102160D-E |
2024-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1207E |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (10-Y 9-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102160D |
Same As/Similar To
SB588 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Passed by for the day