VA HB123 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0868)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0868)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nonpayment of wages; cause of action; penalties. Provides that an employee has a private cause of action against an employer who fails to pay wages to recover the amount of wages due plus interest at eight percent annually from the date the wages were due. If the court finds that the employer knowingly failed to pay wages to an employee, the court shall award the employee (i) reasonable attorney fees and other costs and (ii) an amount equal to triple the amount of wages due. Nonpayment of wages; cause of action; penalties. Provides that an employee has a private cause of action against an employer who fails to pay wages to recover the amount of wages due plus interest at eight percent annually from the date the wages were due. If the court finds that the employer knowingly failed to pay wages to an employee, the court shall award the employee (i) reasonable attorney fees and other costs and (ii) an amount equal to triple the amount of wages due.
Title
Nonpayment of wages; cause of action, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 45-N 1-A) (Y: 51 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N 1-A) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (10-Y 8-N) (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N 1-A) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (10-Y 8-N) (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0868) | |
2020-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 868 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB123ER) |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 45-N 1-A) |
2020-03-02 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108922D-S1 (51-Y 45-N 1-A) |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB123S1 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108922D-S1 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108922D-S1 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N 1-A) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (53-Y 44-N 1-A) |
2020-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 20106941D-EH1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB123EH1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Pending question ordered |
2020-02-04 | House | Amendment by Delegate Carroll Foy agreed to |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106941D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (10-Y 8-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Incorporates HB482 (Kory) |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106941D-H1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2019-12-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101396D |
Same As/Similar To
HB482 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce