VA HB1235 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee ballots; various deadlines related to ballot preparation and receipt; write-in absentee ballots. Requires that ballots be prepared and available for absentee voting not later than 45 days before any election rather than 45 days before the November election and 30 days before other elections. The bill also requires preparation of ballots 45 days in advance of special elections for federal office and allows, if necessary, preparation as soon after that deadline as possible for other special elections. Various deadlines for nominations and filings are adjusted in response to the ballot preparation change. The bill provides that voters who are entitled to vote absentee due to active duty military service, membership in the merchant marines, or temporary residence outside of the country, or the spouse or dependent residing with such a voter, may use a write-in absentee ballot to vote in state and local elections, as well as federal elections. The write-in absentee ballot may also serve as an absentee ballot application and voter registration application for state and local elections, as well as federal elections. Such voters may apply for ballots for multiple elections for a period of one year or through the end of the federal election cycle in which the voter submits his registration, whichever is longer. Current law allows multiple ballots for a period covering two federal elections. The bill also adds a requirement that the electoral board send such military and overseas voters an available printed absentee ballot within three business days. The bill also allows the counting of absentee ballots received from such voters after the close of the polls and two business days before the State Board of Elections meets to ascertain the results and allows adjusting the final returns to include such ballots.
Title
Absentee ballots; procedure for various deadlines and ballot requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0645) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 645 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-12 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-12 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1235ER) | |
2010-03-12 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 10105782D-S2 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1235S2 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Martin agreed to 10105782D-S2 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 10105581D-S1 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 10105782D-S2 (Martin) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105581D-S1 | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1235H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105382D-H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105382D-H1 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reconsidered by Privileges and Elections | |
2010-02-12 | House: Continued to 2011 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote | |
2010-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #3 Campaign Finance | |
2010-01-15 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-01-15 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10103637D |
Same As/Similar To
SB55 (Same As) 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0449)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 679 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |