VA HB1265 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer reporting agencies; medical debt. Prohibits a consumer reporting agency from making any consumer report containing any adverse item of information that the consumer reporting agency knows or should know concerns medical debt except in the case of any consumer report to be used in connection with a credit transaction involving a principal amount that exceeds the national conforming loan limit value for a one-unit property as determined annually by the Federal Housing Finance Agency.
Title
Consumer reporting agencies; prohibited from making reports concerning medical debt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Labor and Commerce |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103884D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 444.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 444.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |