VA HB1272 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-08 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-08 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Governor; removal of board members; public institutions of higher education. Provides that the Governor may remove any member of the board of any public institution of higher education or other educational institution in Virginia with or without cause. Under current law, the Governor may remove a board member for malfeasance, misfeasance, incompetence, or gross neglect of duty.
Title
Higher educational institutions; Governor may remove any board member with or without cause.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-08 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2014-03-08 | House | No further action taken |
2014-02-10 | House | Passed by until Wednesday, February 12, 2014 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-07 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104664D-H1 |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-23 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14104316D |
2014-01-23 | House | Unanimous consent to introduce |