VA HB1279 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Health and Department of Education; school health entrance form. Requires the Department of Health, in conjunction with the Department of Education, to examine the Department of Health's COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA SCHOOL HEALTH ENTRANCE FORM: Health Information Form/Comprehensive Physical Examination Report/Certification of Immunization and make such changes as they deem necessary to streamline such form, make it available in both digital and print formats, and make it more user-friendly for families, physicians, and other health care professionals while continuing to gather all of the information that is necessary to comply with relevant state laws relating to student health and immunization and school attendance. Department of Health and Department of Education; school health entrance form. Requires the Department of Health, in conjunction with the Department of Education, to examine the Department of Health's COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA SCHOOL HEALTH ENTRANCE FORM: Health Information Form/Comprehensive Physical Examination Report/Certification of Immunization and make such changes as they deem necessary to streamline such form, make it available in both digital and print formats, and make it more user-friendly for families, physicians, and other health care professionals while continuing to gather all of the information that is necessary to comply with relevant state laws relating to student health and immunization and school attendance.
Title
School health entrance form; Departments of Education and Health to streamline.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 478 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1279ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-05 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Public Education |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1279H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107090D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107090D-H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103732D |