VA HB130 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; military retirement pay subtraction. Establishes an individual income tax subtraction for annual retirement compensation received for service as a member of the Armed Forces of the United States or the Virginia National Guard. The subtraction is effective beginning with the 2012 taxable year.
Title
Income tax, state; military retirement pay subtraction.
Sponsors
Del. Terry Kilgore [R] | Del. Donald Merricks [R] | Del. John O'Bannon [R] | Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Del. Gordon Helsel [R] | Del. Larry Rush [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Finance |
2012-02-06 | House | Continued to 2013 in Finance by voice vote |
2012-01-12 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2012-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2012-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100284D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB130 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB130+hil |