VA HB1312 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388)
Summary
Workforce development; Governor's responsibilities. Provides that the strategic plan for workforce development shall be developed in coordination with the development of the comprehensive economic development policy required from the Governor during the first year of his administration. The bill changes the staff support for the Virginia Workforce Council from the Office of the Governor to the Virginia Community College System. The Governor, as Chief Workforce Development Officer, is required to report on the transfer of Workforce Investment Act responsibilities from the Virginia Employment Commission to the Virginia Community College System and to provide evaluations of the accountability and performance of workforce programs. The bill is identical to
Title
Workforce development; Governor's responsibilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388) | |
2008-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 388 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1312ER) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1312H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 080188448-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Committee substitute printed 080188448-H1 | |
2008-02-07 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-22 | House: Referred from General Laws by voice vote | |
2008-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: Professional/Occupational/Adminstrative Process | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081803816 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1312 |