VA HB1354 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Uninsured motorist insurance coverage. Provides that a nonresident motor vehicle that is insured under a motor vehicle liability insurance policy issued in another state with coverage limits that are less than those required for Virginia-registered motor vehicles shall not be deemed to be an uninsured vehicle, although it may be underinsured. The measure also provides that a vehicle is underinsured when, and to the extent that, coverage available for payment from all liability insurance sources for bodily injury and property damage is less than the coverage afforded an injured person.
Title
Uninsured motorist insurance; coverage for nonresident motor vehicle insured in another state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-11 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House | |
2010-02-11 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-04 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-22 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10104284D |