VA HB1393 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Continued to 2025 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Continued to 2025 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; return to work for law-enforcement officers. Allows a retired law-enforcement officer to return to work full time as a law-enforcement officer and continue to receive his pension under the Virginia Retirement System. Such person shall be required to have a break in service of at least six calendar months before reemployment. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2025. Virginia Retirement System; return to work for law-enforcement officers. Allows a retired law-enforcement officer to return to work full time as a law-enforcement officer and continue to receive his pension under the Virginia Retirement System. Such person shall be required to have a break in service of at least six calendar months before reemployment. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2025.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; return to work for law-enforcement officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | House | Continued to 2025 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105361D |
Same As/Similar To
HB99 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations