VA HB1402 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highway maintenance payments; bicycle and transit lanes. Provides that cities and towns that receive highway maintenance payments from the Commonwealth based on moving-lane-miles of highway will not have such payments reduced if moving-lane-miles of highway are converted to transit-only lanes and allows the City of Richmond to convert 20 moving-lanes to bicycle lanes and not lose its maintenance payment. The bill also directs the Secretary of Transportation to report by December 1, 2015, on an appropriate maintenance formula for bicycle lanes.
Title
Highway maintenance; payments to City of Richmond for moving-lanes converted to bicycle lanes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 9-N) (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 12-N) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 12-N) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 722 (effective 7/1/15) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1402ER2) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 9-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (89-Y 9-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1402ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 13-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105264D-S1 (85-Y 13-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1402S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105264D-S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105264D-S1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 12-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (84-Y 12-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1402H1 |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104112D-H1 |
2015-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104112D-H1 |
2015-01-27 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (17-Y 4-N) |
2015-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-12-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-12-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101537D |