VA HB1413 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522)
Summary
Public utilities; competitive bidding. Requires public utilities that are subject to annual review provisions of Title 56 to use competitive bidding in purchasing and construction practices. Currently, only utilities subject to the biennial review provisions of Title 56 are subject to the competitive bidding requirement.
Title
Public utilities; required to use competitive bidding in purchasing and construction practices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522) | |
2008-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 522 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-04 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1413ER) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-11 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-11 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House | |
2008-02-11 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-05 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Assigned C & L sub: 3 Energy | |
2008-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-11 | House: Presented and ordered printed 086568812 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1413 |