VA HB1442 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1232)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1232)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Photo speed monitoring devices; civil penalty. Authorizes state and local law-enforcement agencies to operate photo speed monitoring devices, defined in the bill, in or around school crossing zones and highway work zones for the purpose of recording images of vehicles that are traveling at speeds of at least 10 miles per hour above the posted school crossing zone or highway work zone speed limit within such school crossing zone or highway work zone when such zone is indicated by conspicuously placed signs displaying the maximum speed limit and that such photo speed monitoring devices are used in the area. The bill provides that the operator of a vehicle shall be liable for a monetary civil penalty, not to exceed $100, if such vehicle is found to be traveling at speeds of at least 10 miles per hour above the posted highway work zone or school crossing zone speed limit by the photo speed monitoring device. The bill provides that if the summons for a violation is issued by mail, the violation shall not be reported on the driver's operating record or to the driver's insurance agency, but if the violation is personally issued by an officer at the time of the violation, such violation shall be part of the driver's record and used for insurance purposes. The bill provides that the civil penalty will be paid to the locality in which the violation occurred if the summons is issued by a local law-enforcement officer and paid to the Literary Fund if the summons is issued by a law-enforcement officer employed by the Department of State Police.
Title
Photo speed monitoring devices; civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-01 - House - House: VOTE: (48-Y 44-N) (Y: 48 N: 44 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (49-Y 43-N) (Y: 49 N: 43 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (49-Y 43-N) (Y: 49 N: 43 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1232) | |
2020-04-22 | House | Enacted, Chapter 1232 (effective 7/1/20) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1442ER2) |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | VOTE: (48-Y 44-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (48-Y 44-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1442ER) |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate substitute with amendments agreed to by House 20108777D-S1 (49-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (23-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments HB1442S1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108777D-S1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Adoption (49-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (10-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108777D-S1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (53-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1442H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107126D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-30 | House | Incorporates HB621 (Willett) |
2020-01-30 | House | Incorporates HB1721 (Hurst) |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107126D-H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 8-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102488D |
Same As/Similar To
HB621 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Incorporated by Transportation
HB1721 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
HB1721 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation