VA HB148 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax assessment; date to fix tax rate. Changes from April 15 to May 15 the date by which a county, city, or town is required to fix the real property tax rate for taxes due on or before June 30.
Title
Real property tax assessment; changes date counties, cities, and towns are required to fix tax rate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N) (Y: 2 N: 99 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N) (Y: 2 N: 99 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 663 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB148ER) |
2016-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-08 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senators: McDougle, Vogel, Lucas |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2016-03-03 | House | Delegates: Fowler, Orrock, Filler-Corn |
2016-03-03 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2016-03-03 | House | House acceded to request |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (2-Y 96-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Printed as engrossed 16102122D-E |
2016-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB148E |
2016-02-03 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-01 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102122D |
Same As/Similar To
SB445 (Same As) 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0657)