VA HB1486 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vacant buildings; registration. Permits any county, city, or town to require, by ordinance, the owner of any building that has been vacant for at least 12 months and (i) that meets the definition of "derelict building" in relevant law, (ii) that meets the definition of "criminal blight" in relevant law, or (iii) in which a locality has determined a person is living without the authority of the owner to register such building annually. Under current law, any city and certain towns are permitted to require the owner of any building that has been vacant for at least 12 months and meets the definition of "derelict building" in relevant law to register such building annually.
Title
Vacant buildings; registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 39-N) (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 39-N) (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 613 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1486ER) |
2024-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (10-Y 4-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (61-Y 39-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (61-Y 39-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-26 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (13-Y 7-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105791D |
Same As/Similar To
HB476 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
SB48 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0616)
SB48 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0616)