VA HB1494 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB1422-Albo) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB1422-Albo) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Homestead exemption. Increases from $5,000 to $15,000 the homestead exemption for every householder.
Title
Homestead exemption; increases from $5,000 to $15,000 for every householder.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-31 | House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB1422-Albo) by voice vote | |
2011-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1422-Albo) by voice vote | |
2011-01-10 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2010-12-16 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-12-16 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101071D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1422 (Similar To) 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761)
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1494 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1494+hil |