VA HB1523 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
State parks; procurement exemption; Natural Area Preservation Funds created. Exempts the Department of Conservation and Recreation from competitive sealed bidding or competitive negotiation for the purchase of items for resale at retail outlets and food services operations at state parks. The bill also establishes the Natural Areas Preservation Projects Fund and the Natural Areas Preservation Acquisition and Development Fund.
Title
State parks; procurement exemption, Natural Area Preservation Funds created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2024-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government and Capital Outlay |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106481D-H1 |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Procurement/Open Government |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105069D |