VA HB1530 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Defeated by Senate (18-Y 22-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Defeated by Senate (18-Y 22-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
No-fault divorce; corroboration requirement. Removes the corroborating witness requirement for no-fault divorces.
Title
No-fault divorce; corroboration requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (18-Y 22-N) (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (7-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (7-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (18-Y 22-N) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (7-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-29 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 40-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-01-27 | House | Pending question ordered |
2020-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104989D |