VA HB158 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Devocalization of cats and dogs; penalty. Requires veterinarians to keep records of devocalization procedures and provides that any person, including a licensed veterinarian, who performs a surgical devocalization on a cat or dog when such procedure is not necessary to treat or relieve an illness, disease, or injury or to correct a congenital abnormality that is causing or may cause the animal physical pain or harm is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Devocalization of cats and dogs; veterinarians to keep records of procedures, etc., penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2012-02-01 | House | Continued to 2013 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2012-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote |
2012-01-18 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture |
2012-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2012-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103506D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB158 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB158+hil |