VA HB1617 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education; student organizations. Permits, to the extent allowed by law, religious or political student organizations at public institutions of higher education to determine that only persons committed to the organization's mission may conduct certain activities. The bill also prohibits, to the extent allowed by law, public institutions of higher education from discriminating against a student organization that makes such a determination.
Title
Student organizations; religious or political organizations may determine core functions, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Todd Gilbert [R] | Del. Robert Marshall [R] | Del. Christopher Peace [R] |
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (7-Y 4-N) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 82 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (7-Y 4-N) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 82 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696) | |
2013-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 696 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1617ER) |
2013-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (7-Y 4-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (80-Y 19-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1617H1 |
2013-01-30 | House | Motion to pass by Amendment offered by Delegate Morrissey agreed to |
2013-01-30 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13103902D-H1 |
2013-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 13103902D-H1 |
2013-01-28 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education and Arts |
2013-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101946D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1074 (Same As) 2013-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)