VA HB162 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Appeals to the Supreme Court of Virginia and the Court of Appeals of Virginia; filing of an appendix by CD-ROM. Permits the parties to an appeal to the Supreme Court of Virginia or the Court of Appeals of Virginia, in lieu of the filing of any tangible copies of an appendix, to file the same by CD-ROM or such other digital or electronic format permitted under the Rules of Supreme Court of Virginia.
Title
Appeals to Supreme Court of Va. and Court of Appeals of Va; filing of an appendix by CD-ROM.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-01-27 | House | Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2014-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2013-12-20 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100691D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 01 | 673.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 675.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB162 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB162+hil |