VA HB1642 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0269)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0269)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act; representations related to special flood hazard zones. Requires the owner's representation to a prospective purchaser of residential property under the Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act that the owner makes no representations with respect to whether the property is located in one or more special flood hazard areas and purchasers are advised to exercise whatever due diligence they deem necessary, including (i) obtaining a flood certification or mortgage lender determination of whether the property is located in one or more special flood hazard areas, (ii) review of any map depicting special flood hazard areas, and (iii) whether flood insurance is required, in accordance with terms and conditions as may be contained in the real estate purchase contract, but in any event, prior to settlement pursuant to such contract. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act; representations related to special flood hazard areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0269) | |
2015-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 269 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/27/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1642ER) |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105128D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1642S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105128D-S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105128D-S1 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1642H1 |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104066D-H1 |
2015-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104066D-H1 |
2015-01-22 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101756D |
Same As/Similar To
SB775 (Same As) 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0079)