VA HB1653 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voter identification; accepted forms of identification. Adds to the list of accepted forms of identification for purposes of voting valid student photo identification cards issued by any private school located in the Commonwealth. Students of public high schools are currently permitted to use their student photo identification cards for purposes of voting because current law allows the use of photo identification issued by the Commonwealth or one of its political subdivisions. Current law also allows students from both public and private institutions of higher education located in the Commonwealth to use their student photo identification cards for purposes of voting. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 2, 2016.
Title
Voter identification; accepted forms of identification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 16-N) (Y: 84 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 16-N) (Y: 84 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 571 (effective 1/2/16) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1653ER) |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 16-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (84-Y 16-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 15101011D-E |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1653E |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-30 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (18-Y 4-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2015-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101011D |